THE MAYOR OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM'S APPEAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees shall hold the trust fund and its income upon trust to apply to such charitable institution or institutions or for such charitable purpose or purposes within the area of the London Borough of Hammersmith and Fulham ("the area of benefit") as the trustees shall decide in particular:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 May 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 05 July 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Pygram | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
OLUWAKAYODE ADEWUMI | Trustee | 22 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/05/2020 | 21/05/2021 | 21/05/2022 | 21/05/2023 | 21/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.46k | £100 | £600 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.13k | £4.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 May 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2022 | 17 April 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 May 2020 | 07 December 2021 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM (SEE TRUST DEED FOR PARTICULAR APPLICATIONS OF FUNDS)
Area of benefit
HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
MAYOR'S OFFICE
ROOM 201
TOWN HALL
W6 9JU
- Phone:
- 02087532013
- Email:
- mayor@lbhf.gov.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window