WORCESTER SNOEZELEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE LEISURE AND THERAPY FACILITIES FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES WHO HAVE ANY TYPE OF PHYSICAL, SENSORY OR LEARNING DISABILITY. THESE INCLUDE MULTI-SENSORY STIMULATION, HYDROTHERAPY AND CREATIVE ARTS. AS WELL AS THERAPY WE ALSO OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS TO GAIN ATTAINMENTS THROUGH PERFORMING, EXHIBITIONS, AND ACCREDITATION.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Total income includes £4,702 from 5 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 July 1993: Standard registration
- 03 May 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 May 2022: Funds transferred to 1188079 WORCESTER SNOEZELEN CIO
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £344.14k | £313.40k | £302.68k | £310.14k | £338.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £298.68k | £325.45k | £279.37k | £314.19k | £325.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.60k | £4.26k | £6.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | £4.05k | £4.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 22 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 22 November 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 SEPTEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 1 JULY 1993, 23 SEPTEMBER 1996 AND 18 SEPTEMBER 2000. AS AMENDED ON 16 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE DISABILITIES AND/OR ADDITIONAL NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF MULTI-SENSORY LEISURE THERAPY AS A COMMUNITY RESOURCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window