WINKLEIGH WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sport and Recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 09 July 1993: Standard registration
- WINKLEIGH WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL WILSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Kirkpatrick Warner | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN TAYLOR | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Robert Jacobs | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WOOLLACOTT | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
RONALD INDGE | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.98k | £45.84k | £45.96k | £28.92k | £69.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.70k | £28.49k | £57.18k | £24.60k | £73.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £37.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 9TH AUGUST 1948
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF LECTURES, CLASSES, RECREATIONS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WINKLEIGH IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS, SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THE CONVEYANCE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WINKLEIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winkleigh Sports Centre
WINKLEIGH
Devon
EX19 8HZ
- Phone:
- 07813 158568
- Email:
- wwmrff_secretary@outlook.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window