WILLIAM BULLER FAGG CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds to be used for the benefit of the Royal Anthropological Institute of Great Britain and Ireland with special emphasis on the Library of the British Museum and the development of the Institute's Anthropological Index
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 July 1993: Standard registration
- 24 July 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 24 July 2019: Funds transferred to 246269 ROYAL ANTHROPOLOGICAL INSTITUTE OF GREAT BRITAIN A...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/07/2014 | 10/07/2015 | 10/07/2016 | 10/07/2017 | 10/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.33k | £37.65k | £36.76k | £39.88k | £37.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.87k | £37.27k | £34.31k | £41.02k | £40.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 10 July 2018 | 24 August 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2018 | 24 August 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 10 July 2017 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2017 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 10 July 2016 | 23 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 July 2016 | 23 August 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 9 JUNE 1989 AND CODICIL PROVED ON 29 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window