Accounts and annual returns HASLAND THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1023574
Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 03 March 2025 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 26 June 2023 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 26 June 2023 452 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 May 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 03 May 2021 33 days late Download Open in new window