Trustees HASLAND THEATRE COMPANY
Charity number: 1023574

Charity reporting is overdue by 40 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HEATHER COWLEY | Chair | 24 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Williams | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Beards | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lilly Beards | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS BANNISTER | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Beards | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.