Financial history LITTLE DRAGONS PRE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1023583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £109.30k £98.17k £119.17k £134.83k £143.51k
Total expenditure £106.41k £98.07k £118.59k £123.14k £137.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £120.80k £142.05k
Income from government grants £2.20k £8.09k N/A N/A £0