LITTLE DRAGONS PRE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local committee run pre school in Dorset and operate from a detached unit in the grounds of a local primary school. We currently provide care for 39 children aged 2 years 3 months - 4 years old. We help prepare them for reception/primary school and follow the EYFS guidelines to achieve this. To run smoothly we rely on Government funding, fees from parents and fundraising for resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £142,047 from 1 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 12 July 1993: Standard registration
- 09 February 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 March 2012: Re-registered
- EASTON PLAYSCHOOL (Previous name)
- EASTON PRE SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nikki Avery | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Skillman | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.30k | £98.17k | £119.17k | £134.83k | £143.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.41k | £98.07k | £118.59k | £123.14k | £137.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £120.80k | £142.05k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.20k | £8.09k | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1971 AND AMENDED 13 NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED 21 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Dragons Preschool
C/O St Georges Primary School
Clarence Road
Portland
Dorset
DT5 2BD
- Phone:
- 01305826167
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window