Accounts and annual returns AQUARIUS WOMENS CLUB

Charity number: 1023667
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 December 2024 334 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required