AQUARIUS WOMENS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Ladies Club and we provide educational and recreational evenings for all women of the Havering area. Also we hold charitable events, and help support other charities where we can.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Havering
Governance
- 12 July 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Green | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Innes | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irene Collier | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sue Warrington | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.89k | £1.06k | £8.19k | £13.39k | £13.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.15k | £1.62k | £11.66k | £14.57k | £12.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2024 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION FOR WOMEN IN HORNCHURCH
Area of benefit
ELM PARK HORNCHURCH ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
115 Laburnum Walk
HORNCHURCH
Essex
RM12 5RJ
- Phone:
- 01708448122
- Email:
- s.warrington@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window