STILLINGTON UNDER FIVES

Charity number: 1023684
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Stillington Under Fives operates a pre-school Playgroup over 3 days offering funded places to 2, 3 and 4 year olds and is based at Stillington Community Primary School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019

Total income: £15,781
Total expenditure: £23,872

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 1993: Standard registration
  • 03 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £27.83k £30.33k £36.12k £27.92k £15.78k
Total expenditure £26.19k £26.99k £28.50k £30.88k £23.87k
Income from government contracts £14.33k £15.57k £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £25.20k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 31 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 May 2017 120 days late