Financial history EAST LEAKE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1023726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £167.48k £177.07k £173.90k £188.12k £169.19k
Total expenditure £168.15k £175.80k £207.22k £171.10k £154.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £126.45k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A