EAST LEAKE PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1023726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is an independent, non-profit making pre-school playgroup that operates in South Nottinghamshire. The playgroup accepts children aged 2-5 years old.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £169,194
Total expenditure: £154,902

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Haynes Chair 29 October 2021
None on record
Vivienne Powell Trustee 20 December 2024
None on record
Rebecca Powell Trustee 08 October 2024
None on record
Joseph Noble Trustee 09 March 2023
None on record
Sophie Lake Trustee 12 October 2022
None on record
Amy Foxon Trustee 31 March 2020
None on record
Deborah Porter Trustee 10 November 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £167.48k £177.07k £173.90k £188.12k £169.19k
Total expenditure £168.15k £175.80k £207.22k £171.10k £154.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £126.45k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Old School
School Green
East Leake
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE12 6LG
Phone:
01509559926