THE ASSOCIATION FOR LOGIC PROGRAMMING LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's object and its principal activity is to promote and undertake scientific research in the field of computer science and in particular in logic programming and to disseminate the results of such research and to encourage and develop knowledge and use of the logic programming in all its branches for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Canada
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Faroe Islands
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Luxembourg
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Pakistan
- Poland
- Portugal
- Réunion
- Romania
- Scotland
- Singapore
- South Africa
- Spain
- Turkey
- United States
Governance
- 14 July 1993: Standard registration
- A L P (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION FOR LOGIC PROGRAMMING LIMITED (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Malcolm King | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marina Yvonne Richard De Vos | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manuel Victor De Hermenegildo Salinas | Trustee | 20 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.20k | £6.29k | £6.86k | £742 | £6.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.02k | £6.41k | £1.54k | £5.87k | £6.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 AUGUST 1987 AMENDED 12 JANUARY 1988 AND 22 JUNE 1993 as amended on 03 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND UNDERTAKE SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH IN THE FIELD OF COMPUTER SCIENCE AND IN PARTICULAR IN LOGIC PROGRAMMING AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, AND TO ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP KNOWLEDGE AND USE OF THE LOGIC PROGRAMMING IN ALL ITS BRANCHES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Care of Dr De Vos
Department of Computer Science
University of Bath
Claverton Down, Bath
Avon, England
BA2 7AY
- Phone:
- 01225385053
- Email:
- cssmdv@bath.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window