HAMSTEELS COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE A VENUE FOR LOCAL GROUPS AND CLUBS. INC HISTORY GROUPS LUNCHEON CLUB FOR ELDERLY LOCAL RESIDENTS PARISH MEETINGS SOCIAL HOUSING MEETINGS POLICE AND COMMUNITY MEETINGS VENUE FOR LOCAL SPORTS CLUB INC BOWLS CLUB, LINE DANCING,ZUMBA History Group0001
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Durham
Governance
- 14 July 1993: Standard registration
- HAMSTEELS COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Ann Burnard | Chair | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nena Chisholm | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Chisholm | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Walker | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Wilson | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Burnard | Trustee | 12 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
RHODA MAKEPEACE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.42k | £37.83k | £34.18k | £31.24k | £25.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.35k | £15.89k | £42.24k | £29.60k | £26.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.64k | £22.26k | N/A | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 03 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 01 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 DECEMBER 1963
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HAMSTEELS HOUSING ESTATE BY THE PROVISIONOF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HAMSTEELS AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hamsteels Community Centre
Western Avenue
Esh Winning
DURHAM
DH7 9LS
- Phone:
- 01914472332
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window