LOOSE PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT AND TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is to enhance the education and wellbeing of the children at Loose Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 14 July 1993: Standard registration
- 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 31 March 2011: Re-registered
- 29 April 2015: Funds received from 1018494 LOOSE JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
- LOOSE INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- LOOSE INFANT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola-Marie Turrell | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nikita Terry | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Adam Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.19k | £16.06k | £8.43k | £31.96k | £25.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.77k | £6.06k | £8.33k | £28.65k | £20.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 February 2021 | 224 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUN 1993 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 JUN 2005 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEP 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loose Primary School
Loose Road
MAIDSTONE
Kent
ME15 9UW
- Phone:
- 07701347682
- Email:
- looseptapayments@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window