Financial history 1st Sharpness St Andrews Scout and Guide Groups

Charity number: 1023775
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022 01/06/2023 01/06/2024
Total gross income £12.36k £280 £1.82k £2.24k £2.05k
Total expenditure £2.10k £3.85k £1.97k £2.10k £2.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A