NORTH WRAXALL PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1023793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

VILLAGE PRESCHOOL REGISTERED FOR 25 CHILDREN

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £71,112
Total expenditure: £72,762

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 July 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NORTH WRAXALL PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (Working name)
  • NORTH WRAXALL PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tina Lang Chair 01 September 2017
None on record
Rhiannon MacDivitt Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Zara Pike Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Jenna Jones Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Clemmie Jackson Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £70.05k £78.29k £64.79k £74.45k £71.11k
Total expenditure £73.98k £71.91k £66.35k £71.87k £72.76k
Income from government contracts £40.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £51.41k £42.33k £43.81k £50.81k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 11 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 25 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
New Hall
Lower North Wraxall
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 7AF
Phone:
01225891550