CYMDEITHAS DDAWNS WERIN CYMRU ( WELSH FOLK DANCE SOCIETY )

Charity Number: 1023817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hybu a dysgu dawnsio gwerin Cymraeg

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,858
Total expenditure: £11,608

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 July 1993: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Idris Jones Chair 09 May 2017
ANHEDDAU CYF
Received: On time
Frances Jones Trustee 18 May 2019
None on record
G IDWAL WILLIAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.17k £7.24k £16.07k £17.08k £11.86k
Total expenditure £11.01k £2.74k £4.35k £10.35k £11.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
DISGWYLFA
STATION ROAD
LLANRUG
CAERNARFON
LL55 4BA
Phone:
01286673485