MANORCROFT SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foster a mutual understanding between parents, teachers and governors and all associated with the adminstration of the school and to assist the school in obtaining amenities in addition to those provided through the normal annual grants and estimates of the Education Committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 August 1993: Standard registration
- MANORCROFT SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Young | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hudson | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.00k | £16.55k | £15.66k | £48.04k | £34.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.48k | £10.65k | £14.46k | £24.27k | £18.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 November 2024 | 149 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 August 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 October 2024 | 477 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 SEPTEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO ADVANC ETHE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE EGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANORCROFT PRIMARY SCHOOL
MANORCROFTS ROAD
EGHAM
TW20 9LX
- Phone:
- 01784432155
- Email:
- pta@manorcroft.surrey.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window