Governing document FORTIS GREEN KIDS' CLUB
Charity number: 1023826
Up to date (2 days late)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 1993 AS AMENDED 6 SEPTEMBER 2001, 8 MAY 2003 AND 9 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 27 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CLUB SHALL BE TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS FOR CHILDREN AGED 4 TO 11 FOR THE AFTER SCHOOL CLUB AND FOR CHILDREN AGED 4 TO 12 FOR THE HOLIDAY PLAYSCHEMES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN PRACTICE MUSWELL HILL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.