Financial history BUSY KIDS @ BROMHAM

Charity Number: 1023829
Charity reporting is up to date (204 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £197.90k £220.20k £219.86k £197.73k £209.62k
Total expenditure £191.84k £212.05k £246.26k £251.71k £227.07k
Income from government contracts £92.10k £107.96k £92.49k £56.06k £51.69k
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k £48.61k £5.21k N/A