Financial history SPETISBURY AND CHARLTON MARSHALL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1023882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £105.72k £89.16k £110.08k £138.10k £179.75k
Total expenditure £113.91k £97.62k £108.27k £106.65k £138.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £57.35k £44.73k £42.79k £60.52k £85.92k