ANTHONY ROPER PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a P.T.A. who raise money for the Anthony Roper Primary School. All the money we raise is given to the school to be spent on educational resources and services that benefit the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 16 July 1993: Standard registration
- ANTHONY ROPER COUNTY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam William Nicholls | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Helen Simmons | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Amy Muckle | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Louise Carter | Trustee | 30 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Clare Jarrett-Smith | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA DRAKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.28k | £6.15k | £15.68k | £19.35k | £16.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.36k | £4.32k | £16.81k | £10.73k | £20.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MAY 1993 as amended on 03 Oct 2019
Charitable objects
Clause 2. The object of the Association is to advance the education, health and well-being of the pupils in the school. In furtherance of this object the Association may:- (a) Develop more extended relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school. (b) Engage in activities which support the school and advance the education, health and well-being of the pupils attending it. (c) Provide and assist in the provision of such facilities or items for education, health and well-being at the school ( not provided for from statutory funds) as the committee in consultation with the Governing Body shall from time to time determine.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH STREET
EYNSFORD
KENT
DA4 0AA
- Phone:
- 01322863680
- Email:
- anthonyroperpta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window