BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUTRITION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Development, collation and dissemination of information and education relating to undernutrition and nutritional support in the UK. It is also active in research in this area. Membership is multidisciplinary including clinicians, dietitians, nurses, pharmacists, scientists and patients
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Total income includes £43,722 from 1 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 July 1993: Standard registration
- 18 August 2020: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 August 2020: Funds transferred to 1186719 BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUT...
- BAPEN (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £349.00k | £164.48k | £392.99k | £342.42k | £377.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £401.00k | £262.12k | £401.14k | £341.53k | £322.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £43.72k | £0 | £43.72k | £43.72k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 17 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 11 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2017
(These accounts |
11 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 01 November 2017 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2016
(These accounts |
01 November 2017 | 1 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/05/1993 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2013 AS AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2016 as amended on 20 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN THOSE WHO HAVE BECOME OR ARE LIKELY TO BECOME MALNOURISHED AND WHO ARE UNABLE TO CONSUME OR ABSORB FOOD IN SUFFICIENT QUANTITIES TO EFFECT RECOVERY. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF HEALTH WORKERS OF ALL KINDS, PATIENTS, POLICY MAKERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC, IN THE IMPORTANCE OF AND THE METHODS FOR, THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MALNUTRITION DURING ILLNESS. (3) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF CLINICAL NUTRITION AND HUMAN METABOLISM ON CONDITION THAT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH ARE PUBLISHED
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window