Financial history PETERBOROUGH ENVIRONMENT CITY TRUST

Charity number: 1023929
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £676.65k £1.11m £1.65m £2.17m £2.06m
Total expenditure £609.51k £854.64k £1.38m £1.72m £1.67m
Income from government contracts £7.60k N/A £13.08k £11.38k £73.86k
Income from government grants £609.53k £35.11k £422.71k £700.24k £254.91k
Income - Donations and legacies £22.43k £345.45k £18.07k £15.49k £21.03k
Income - Other trading activities £457.00k £442.69k £693.54k £745.42k £912.78k
Income - Charitable activities £126.90k £250.42k £912.66k £1.40m £1.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.91k £15.78k £27.12k £16.35k £18.79k
Income - Other £53.42k £50.94k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £270.32k £549.67k £965.94k £1.27m £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £339.19k £304.98k £416.00k £448.59k £592.90k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £7.50k £7.50k £7.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £36.51k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0