Trustees PETERBOROUGH ENVIRONMENT CITY TRUST
Charity number: 1023929

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby William Willison | Chair | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Holland | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Ashley Sutherland | Trustee | 17 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Cole | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Penelope Hansen | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Barbara Wright | Trustee | 22 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Walker-Harrison | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steven Trewhella | Trustee | 28 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Brotherton | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.