Financial history MILKING BANK HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1023983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £6.01k £5.64k £8.94k £8.42k £8.28k
Total expenditure £5.75k £7.14k £6.81k £5.58k £7.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A