Trustees FRIENDS OF ASHLEY SCHOOL
Charity number: 1024028

Charity reporting is up to date (128 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Louise Platt | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Caplan | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Sarah Parker | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Wilson | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Grillo | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Birks | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Furber | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.