HISTORIC AIRCRAFT FLIGHT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Historic Aircraft Flight (HAF) Trust helps to preserve Historic Army Air Corps aircraft as a 'living museum' for veterans commemorative and memorial purposes, as an aid to recruiting and to supporting wider Army heritage in public. The Trust relies principally on donations. The fund is used to provide goods and services for the HAF that no longer available from or attributable to public funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 July 1993: Standard registration
- 22 April 2024: Funds received from 1088895 THE ASSAULT GLIDER TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HISTORIC AIRCRAFT FLIGHT TRUSTEE LTD | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.64k | £86.84k | £76.24k | £93.56k | £20.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.05k | £64.83k | £44.91k | £61.85k | £71.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.94k | £2.95k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01/06/1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF AVIATION IN THE ARMY AND TO EDUCATE THE MEMBERS THEREOF AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AVIATION HISTORY TRADITIONS AND EXPLOITS OF THE ARMY IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE IN FLYING ORDER OF THE ARMY'S HISTORIC AIRCRAFT FLIGHT (HAF(T))
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o HQ AAC
Middle Wallop
STOCKBRIDGE
Hampshire
SO20 8DY
- Phone:
- 01264784499
- Email:
- chair@haaf.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window