THE KINGS COLLEGE HOSPITAL NURSES LEAGUE EDUCATIONAL GRANTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further the education of registered nurses and midwives who are members of the Kings College Hospital Nurses League in furtherance of this object the trustees shall apply the net income of the trust in one or more of the following ways:- in awarding to such persons grants towards post registration education and attendance at the professional conferences and courses approved by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Southwark
Governance
- 23 July 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNIFER MARGARET COLEMAN | Chair | 12 March 2012 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE SPIERS | Trustee | 19 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
MISS MISS HEGGIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88k | £12.34k | £7.89k | £13.57k | £4.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.39k | £15.77k | £18.93k | £18.75k | £18.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 31 August 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 4 MAY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF REGISTERED NURSES AND MIDWIVES WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE KINGS COLLEGE HOSPITAL NURSES LEAGUE IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE NET INCOME OF THE TRUST IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS :- IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS GRANTS TOWARDS POST REGISTRATION EDUCATION AND ATTENDANCE AT THE PROFESSIONAL CONFERENCES AND COURSES APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; IN OTHER WAYS FUTHERING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS; IN AWARDING AN ANNUAL BURSARY TO BE CALLED THE I.C.S BROWN BURSARY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF A BEQUEST CONTAINED IN THE WILL OF THE LATE ISOBEL CHRISTINE STEWART BROWN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THAT BEQUEST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heatherdene
Chuck Hatch
Hartfield
TN7 4EX
- Phone:
- 01892770477
- Email:
- chrissiespiers08@gmail.com
- Website:
-
kch-nursesleague.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window