COUPLES FOR CHRIST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Religion amongst married and soon to be married couples and in particular to promote and encourage Christian attitudes, values and behaviour within the context of family relationships.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Kent
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 July 1993: Standard registration
- 09 October 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- LIVING WATER COMMUNITY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.49k | £3.73k | £1.57k | £1.67k | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.08k | £4.90k | £1.07k | £1.06k | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 02 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 20 April 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 31 May 2009 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH JULY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONGST MARRIED AND SOON TO BE MARRIED COUPLES AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE CHRISTIAN ATTITUDES, VALUES AND BEHAVIOUR WITHIN THE CONTEXT OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window