Financial history MARY WARD LEGAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1024148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.23m £1.34m £1.01m £1.08m £1.33m
Total expenditure £1.20m £1.23m £1.08m £1.12m £1.29m
Income from government contracts £486.32k £548.62k £614.33k £493.44k £595.06k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £189.40k N/A £256.69k
Income - Donations and legacies £369.07k £225.05k £192.43k £199.49k £353.63k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £837.05k £1.10m £812.73k £877.58k £976.86k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £26.26k £17.59k £4.97k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.18m £1.22m £1.06m £1.11m £1.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.88k £11.51k £11.51k £11.51k £11.72k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0