Financial history HALEBANK PRIMARY SCHOOL PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1024167
Charity reporting is overdue by 85 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £64.00k £85.81k £83.89k £90.00k £67.28k
Total expenditure £58.00k £66.91k £73.11k £76.00k £80.94k
Income from government contracts £50.00k N/A £83.89k £80.00k £56.80k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £5.00k N/A