SHEFFIELD AUTISTIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support group run by volunteers who are parents/carers of people who are on the Autistic Spectrum and/or are on the Autistic Spectrum themselves. Hold daytime meetings each month. Hold online evening meetings via Zoom for Autistic Adults on the second Wednesday of each month. Have a library of books relating to Autism for members to borrow. Have up to date info on our website.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 26 July 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHIL COONEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Patricia Jayne Campbell | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Nield | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
LIZ FRIEND | Trustee | 14 March 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.05k | £2.53k | £4.28k | £1.84k | £8.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.47k | £1.58k | £2.90k | £8.00k | £10.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JULY 1993
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE WELFARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH AUTISM RESIDENT WITHIN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND (B) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF FAMILIES AND CARERS OF CHILDREN WITH AUTISM AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC CONCERNING AUTISM, ITS EFFECTS AND TREATMENT
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 SANDYGATE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 5SB
- Phone:
- 01142304839
- Email:
- philcooney99@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window