Accounts and annual returns PRO AUTISM PARENTS RELATIVES AND OTHERS FOR AUTISM

Charity number: 1024180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window