Financial history PRO AUTISM PARENTS RELATIVES AND OTHERS FOR AUTISM

Charity number: 1024180
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.28k £61.61k £59.84k £66.62k £59.04k
Total expenditure £72.01k £34.41k £8.71k £43.75k £76.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A