PRO AUTISM PARENTS RELATIVES AND OTHERS FOR AUTISM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation for persons with autism, both for respite care and supported living. To provide funds as grants, whenever possible, to aid families with autistic children in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wokingham
Governance
- 27 July 1993: Standard registration
- THE AUTISTIC SHOP (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Micheal Yardley | Chair | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nellie Margaret Gerighty | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Joseph Gerighty | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Anthea Yardley | Trustee | 28 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Elizabeth Johnson | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Rose Gobs | Trustee | 30 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wilhelm Heinrich Gobs | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard David Gobs | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.28k | £61.61k | £59.84k | £66.62k | £59.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.01k | £34.41k | £8.71k | £43.75k | £76.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JULY 1993 as amended on 23 Jul 2020 as amended on 23 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CARE, WELFARE AND RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH AUTISM AND PEOPLE HAVING AUTISTIC OR RELATED FEATURES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Brandon Avenue
Woodley
READING
RG5 4PU
- Phone:
- 07894167738
- Email:
- proautism.charity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window