MILLAIS PTA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING MONEY TO SUPPORT MILLAIS SCHOOL BY HOLDING FUNDRAISING EVENTS SUCH AS QUIZ NIGHTS, PROM FASHION EVENTS, PHOTO DAYS, THEATRE TRIPS, THE SALE OF SECOND-HAND UNIFORM & REFRESHMENTS AT EVENTS & PARENTS EVENINGS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 July 1993: Standard registration
- MILLAIS HOME SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bharat Panchal | Chair | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Tuck RT | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Smith | Trustee | 15 October 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.09k | £2.47k | £2.46k | £2.53k | £2.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.10k | £7.11k | £1.77k | £743 | £4.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 July 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 1989 AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Millais School
Depot Road
Horsham
RH13 5HR
- Phone:
- 01403282012
- Email:
- millaispta@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window