31ST BRIGHTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Group are as a unit of the Scout Association. The main activities in relation to these objectives is the provision of the weekly section meetings, as follows: Beaver Scouts Thursdays 5 - 6. Cub Scouts Thursdays 6.30 - 8, Scouts Wednesdays 6.30 to 8
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 27 July 1993: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 June 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Tomlinson | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
juliet Seymour | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.77k | £7.49k | £3.50k | £1.35k | £3.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £5.46k | £3.00k | £0 | £6.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 March 2022 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
123 WOODLAND AVENUE
HOVE
BN3 6BJ
- Phone:
- 01273507695
- Email:
- JTALLENTED@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window