20TH TORBAY (GRAMMAR SCHOOL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Torbay
Governance
- 30 July 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Jenkins | Chair | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Hedges | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Shears | Trustee | 07 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Fisher | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR PETER ALLAN SNOWDON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.01k | £22.96k | £20.30k | £5.02k | £2.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.45k | £4.39k | £14.72k | £10.12k | £7.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.57k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL INTELLECTUAL SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hampton Lodge
Hampton Avenue
TORQUAY
TQ1 3LA
- Phone:
- 01803311233
- Email:
- louise.anderson@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window