Financial history COMPASS (PETERBOROUGH) LIMITED

Charity Number: 1024250
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £798.35k £782.87k £792.29k £802.29k £829.73k
Total expenditure £796.92k £1.01m £789.92k £771.73k £899.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £162.93k £222.80k £127.20k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £629.36k £579.48k £702.53k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £768.59k £771.73k £899.73k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £21.33k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0