Trustees COUNTY OF GREATER MANCHESTER WEST OF THE GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1024268

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Sellstrom | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Laura Keller | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Bartlett | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Hardman | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Patten | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynette Woods | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Zoe Williams | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Coackley | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Isaac | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.