SHELDON SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Solihull
Governance
- 29 July 1993: Standard registration
- SHELDON SCHOOL CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Councillor Zafar Iqbal MBE JP | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Rev Alexandra Lavin | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE CASHMORE | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.08k | £3.85k | £5.32k | £1.65k | £6.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.11k | £3.50k | £6.43k | £2.33k | £3.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29 APRIL 1993
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE RESIDENT OR WHO HAVE A PARENT RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND IN PARTICULAR (A) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS ETC (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS ETC.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF SHELDON IN THE COUNTY OF WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
97 Rectory Park Road
BIRMINGHAM
B26 3LH
- Phone:
- 07468605603
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window