DOVESIDE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Women's Institute
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 02 August 1993: Standard registration
- 16 December 2008: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- 16 March 2016: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanda Philliskirk | Chair | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Cornes | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marie Smith | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Holmes | Trustee | 02 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elspeth Dickinson | Trustee | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Clarke | Trustee | 07 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Baxter | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Clarke | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Marriott | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annette Styne | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gina Wellsteed | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Hulcoop | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Val Burns | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Debra Joy Childs | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.11k | £2.07k | £3.40k | £7.70k | £4.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.83k | £1.08k | £4.20k | £6.97k | £5.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES (ALREADY LODGED)
Charitable objects
THE MAIN PURPOSE OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION ARE TO ENABLE WOMEN WHO ARE INTERESTED IN ISSUES ASSOCIATED WITH RURAL LIFE, INCLUDING ARTS, CRAFTS AND SCIENCES, TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE, TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION IN CITIZENSHIP, IN PUBLIC QUESTIONS BOTH NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL, IN MUSIC, DRAMA AND OTHER CULTURAL SUBJECTS AND IN ALL BRANCHES OF AGRICULTURE, HANDICRAFTS, HOME ECONOMICS, HEALTH AND SOCIAL WELFARE. IT SEEKS TO GIVE WOMEN THE OPPORTUNITY OF WORKING TOGETHER THROUGH THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION AND OF PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THOSE IDEALS FOR WHICH IT STANDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The White House
19 Church Road
Stretton
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE13 0HD
- Phone:
- 01283 540124
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window