RIVERHEAD INFANTS SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mainly fundraising activities for the school such as social evenings for parents and the summer fair. We also organise non profit making social family events such as a new parent meet-ups and Christmas carol singing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 30 July 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Frances Fern Massey | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Myatt | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Grimwood | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mridula Murali | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Diddams | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67.95k | £12.09k | £20.09k | £29.16k | £43.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.65k | £13.09k | £27.84k | £25.24k | £67.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 1993 as amended on 01 Mar 2022 as amended on 19 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
The object of the Riverhead Infants? School Parent Teacher Association is to advance the education of the pupils by (but not exclusively) providing facilities or equipment for the school
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
RIVERHEAD INFANTS SCHOOL
WORSHIPS HILL
SEVENOAKS
TN13 2AS
- Phone:
- 01732452475
- Email:
- pta@riverhead.kent.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window