THE ETON FIVES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year the Trustees met regularly to progress the Appeal, consider potential beneficiaries for the granting of funds and carry out the routine administrative functions of the Trust; and made specific grants to the Eton Fives Association in support of its efforts to promote coaching at Westway and at certain schools. In addition grants were made directly to a number of schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 July 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Pett | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Chinery | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Katherine Lloyd Wood | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Denys Calder Firth | Trustee | 10 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher Mark Bebb Williams | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|||||
RICHARD ANTHONY DENNIS | Trustee | 07 February 2014 |
|
|||||
JONATHAN PAUL ASQUITH | Trustee | 19 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR DALE VARGAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.36k | £37.39k | £7.22k | £8.19k | £11.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.76k | £13.27k | £27.57k | £47.62k | £55.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 JULY 1993 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE ANY PERSONS OF EITHER SEX UP TO THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN YEARS OR IN THE CASE OF PERSONS RECEIVING FULL TIME EDUCATION UP TO THE AGE OF TWENTY FIVE YEARS TO PLAY THE GAME OF ETON FIVES AND THEREBY TO ASSIST IN ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH PERSONS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF THEIR MINDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Hastoe Row
Church Lane
Hastoe
TRING
Hertfordshire
HP23 6LU
- Phone:
- 07766 958665
- Email:
- nick.jones87@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window