FRIENDS OF BULLERS WOOD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising benefitting the community, pupils and the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 15 October 1993: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF BULLERSWOOD (Working name)
- BULLERS WOOD SCHOOL FOR GIRLS PARENT STAFF ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Veronica Huxtable | Chair | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Virtue- Boussie | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Liz Kirby | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Palmer | Trustee | 29 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kerstin Retzlaff | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Brooks | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Taylor | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Anne Mercer | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike O'Connor | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Helen Tricard | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.01k | £40.95k | £46.12k | £49.37k | £37.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.88k | £43.60k | £21.65k | £80.29k | £48.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 21 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 05 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 05 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1990 AS AMENDED 8TH OCTOBER 1997 as amended on 10 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bullers Wood School for Girls
St. Nicolas Lane
CHISLEHURST
BR7 5LJ
- Phone:
- 02084672280
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window