ABACUS PRE-SCHOOL NURSERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principle activities of the charity include supplying education of children under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups. The nursery is Ofsted registered and PLA accredited to take 20 children per session with a staff ratio of 1:8 for 3 year olds and above, and 1:4 for 2-3 year olds. It is open term time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 10 August 1993: Standard registration
- 30 July 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 30 July 2012: Funds transferred to 1141234 ABACUS PRE SCHOOL NURSERY LTD
- ABACUS PLAYGROUP (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.41k | £58.17k | £59.04k | £49.38k | £12.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.29k | £53.04k | £52.64k | £51.42k | £12.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 22 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 22 February 2012 | 18 July 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 12 May 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 09 May 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 26 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 26 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 25 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 25 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED OCTOBER 1991 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window