ROBIN HOOD PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money for use by the school - primarily for educational equipment. Planned events for year include - Christmas Craft Fayre, School Discos, Summer Fayre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 16 August 1993: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynsey Ryder | Chair | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE FINDLAY | Trustee | 24 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.47k | £13.45k | £6.50k | £9.84k | £12.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.74k | £14.74k | £3.67k | £13.46k | £11.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Robin Hood Primary School
Leeds Road
Robin Hood
WAKEFIELD
WF3 3BG
- Phone:
- 07743062236
- Email:
- walkerjenna1@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window